|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 6527.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6469.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Senate amendments concurred in. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5022.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 1476.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1429.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1331.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|