California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB813 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill June 22, 2015
Bill May 14, 2015
Bill May 7, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015