LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB813
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB813
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB813
Compare Versions
AB813 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB813 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB813 Amended June 22, 2015
AB813 Amended May 14, 2015
AB813 Amended May 7, 2015
AB813 Amended March 26, 2015
AB813 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB813 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB813 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB813 Amended June 22, 2015
AB813 Amended May 14, 2015
AB813 Amended May 7, 2015
AB813 Amended March 26, 2015
AB813 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare