|
08/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 161, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5700.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4727.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3508.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|