California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB898 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill January 13, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016