LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB898
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB898
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB898
Compare Versions
AB898 Chaptered August 22, 2016
AB898 Enrolled August 5, 2016
AB898 Amended June 21, 2016
AB898 Amended January 13, 2016
AB898 Amended January 4, 2016
AB898 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB898 Chaptered August 22, 2016
AB898 Enrolled August 5, 2016
AB898 Amended June 21, 2016
AB898 Amended January 13, 2016
AB898 Amended January 4, 2016
AB898 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare