Assembly | 09/10/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (September 8). | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on FINANCE. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on FINANCE. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25). | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/16/2015 | Read first time. To print. |