California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ABX29 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 16, 2015

Enrolled

Bill March 14, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2016

Amended

Bill March 3, 2016
Bill August 27, 2015