LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX29
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX29
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX29
Compare Versions
ABX29 Chaptered May 4, 2016
ABX29 Enrolled March 14, 2016
ABX29 Amended March 3, 2016
ABX29 Amended August 27, 2015
ABX29 Introduced July 16, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ABX29 Chaptered May 4, 2016
ABX29 Enrolled March 14, 2016
ABX29 Amended March 3, 2016
ABX29 Amended August 27, 2015
ABX29 Introduced July 16, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare