Assembly | 09/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5254.) | ||
Senate | 08/18/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5745.) | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 4). | ||
Assembly | 08/02/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/01/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 09/02/2015 | Introduced. To print. |