BILL NUMBER: ACR 106CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 159 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 22, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 8, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 8, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 1, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gonzalez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Arambula, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Bonta, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chau, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Dababneh, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gordon, Gray, Hadley, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Quirk, Rendon, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) SEPTEMBER 2, 2015 Relative to Diaper Need Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 106, Gonzalez. Diaper Need Awareness Week. This measure would proclaim the week of September 26, 2016, to October 2, 2016, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourage California citizens to donate generously to organizations that distribute diapers to families in need. WHEREAS, Diaper need occurs when a family does not have a sufficient supply of clean diapers to ensure that infants and toddlers are clean and healthy, and can adversely affect the well-being of young children and their families; and WHEREAS, One in three families experiences diaper need at some time while their children are less than three years of age, and nearly half of families delay changing a diaper to extend their supply; and WHEREAS, An infant or toddler requires an average of 50 diaper changes per week over three years; and WHEREAS, Access to a reliable supply of clean diapers is a necessity for the health and welfare of infants and toddlers, their families, and child and health care providers; and WHEREAS, Diapers cannot be purchased with CalFresh benefits or Women, Infants, and Children (WIC) vouchers; therefore, obtaining a sufficient supply of diapers can cause economic hardship for millions of families; and WHEREAS, Diaper need can be a barrier to child care due to the common requirement that a daily supply of diapers be provided by the child's parent or guardian; and WHEREAS, California recognizes that addressing diaper need supports the health of, and economic opportunity for, low-income and middle class families, and the state has a vested interest in reducing diaper need; and WHEREAS, California is proud to be home to several strong nonprofit organizations working at the state and local levels to combat diaper need; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of September 26, 2016, to October 2, 2016, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourages the citizens of California to donate generously to organizations that distribute diapers to families in need; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.