California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR106 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 2, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016