Assembly | 05/17/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3848.) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4035.) | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 8). | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2016 | Introduced. To print. |