LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR111
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR111
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR111
Compare Versions
ACR111 Chaptered May 17, 2016
ACR111 Enrolled May 13, 2016
ACR111 Amended March 28, 2016
ACR111 Amended March 2, 2016
ACR111 Introduced January 6, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR111 Chaptered May 17, 2016
ACR111 Enrolled May 13, 2016
ACR111 Amended March 28, 2016
ACR111 Amended March 2, 2016
ACR111 Introduced January 6, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare