California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2016

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 17, 2016

Amended

Bill March 28, 2016
Bill March 2, 2016