Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3460.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Moorlach. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3463.) Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 1. Page 3463.) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3888.) | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2016 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3573.) | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 25). | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2016 | Introduced. To print. |