LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR114
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR114
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR114
Compare Versions
ACR114 Chaptered April 14, 2016
ACR114 Enrolled April 12, 2016
ACR114 Amended March 10, 2016
ACR114 Amended February 4, 2016
ACR114 Introduced January 11, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR114 Chaptered April 14, 2016
ACR114 Enrolled April 12, 2016
ACR114 Amended March 10, 2016
ACR114 Amended February 4, 2016
ACR114 Introduced January 11, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare