California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill April 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill April 14, 2016

Amended

Bill March 10, 2016
Bill February 4, 2016