California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR117 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2016

Enrolled

Bill February 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill March 3, 2016

Amended

Bill February 4, 2016
Bill January 25, 2016