California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR117 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 03/03/2016

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 117CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 6 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 3, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 25, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 25, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Lackey (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Atkins, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Brough, Brown, Burke, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Frazier, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gordon, Gray, Grove, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Kim, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Patterson, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, and Williams) JANUARY 13, 2016 Relative to Ronald Reagan Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 117, Lackey. Ronald Reagan Day. This measure would declare February 6, 2016, as Ronald Reagan Day. WHEREAS, President Ronald Wilson Reagan, a man of humble background, worked throughout his life serving freedom and advancing the public good, having been employed as an entertainer, union leader, corporate spokesman, Governor of California, and President of the United States; and WHEREAS, Ronald Reagan is the only person in California's 164-year history to be elected to the offices of Governor of the State of California and President of the United States; and WHEREAS, Ronald Reagan served with honor and distinction for two terms as the 40th President of the United States of America, the second of which he earned the confidence of three-fifths of the electorate in 1984, emerging victorious in 49 of the 50 states in the general election--a record unsurpassed in the history of American presidential elections; and WHEREAS, In 1981, when Ronald Reagan was inaugurated President, he inherited a disillusioned nation shackled by rampant inflation and high unemployment; and WHEREAS, President Reagan's commitment to the nation's children helped lower crime and drug use in our neighborhoods; and WHEREAS, President Reagan's commitment to our Armed Forces contributed to the restoration of pride in America, her values, and those cherished by the free world, and prepared America's Armed Forces to meet 21st century challenges; and WHEREAS, President Reagan's vision of "peace through strength" led to the end of the Cold War; and WHEREAS, In 1987 President Reagan gave a speech at the Berlin Wall where he famously told Soviet leader Mikhail Gorbachev to "tear down this wall," which later became reality in 1989; and WHEREAS, February 6, 2016, will be the 105th anniversary of Ronald Reagan's birth, and the 11th since his passing; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature takes great pride in honoring Ronald Reagan for his many contributions to our country and in celebrating his life; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes February 6, 2016, as Ronald Reagan Day; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.