LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR117
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR117
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR117
Compare Versions
ACR117 Chaptered March 3, 2016
ACR117 Enrolled February 26, 2016
ACR117 Amended February 4, 2016
ACR117 Amended January 25, 2016
ACR117 Introduced January 13, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR117 Chaptered March 3, 2016
ACR117 Enrolled February 26, 2016
ACR117 Amended February 4, 2016
ACR117 Amended January 25, 2016
ACR117 Introduced January 13, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare