Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2603.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2120.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Huff.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2015
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 261.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|