California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR12 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 3, 2015

Amended

Bill July 7, 2015
Bill February 5, 2015