LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR12
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR12
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR12
Compare Versions
ACR12 Chaptered September 3, 2015
ACR12 Enrolled August 31, 2015
ACR12 Amended July 7, 2015
ACR12 Amended February 5, 2015
ACR12 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR12 Chaptered September 3, 2015
ACR12 Enrolled August 31, 2015
ACR12 Amended July 7, 2015
ACR12 Amended February 5, 2015
ACR12 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare