Assembly | 04/19/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3548.) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3889.) | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 3). | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. To print. |