LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR141
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR141
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR141
Compare Versions
ACR141 Chaptered April 19, 2016
ACR141 Enrolled April 15, 2016
ACR141 Amended March 10, 2016
ACR141 Amended February 29, 2016
ACR141 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR141 Chaptered April 19, 2016
ACR141 Enrolled April 15, 2016
ACR141 Amended March 10, 2016
ACR141 Amended February 29, 2016
ACR141 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare