California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2016

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2016

Amended

Bill March 10, 2016
Bill February 29, 2016