Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4879.) | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5478.) | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Introduced. To print. |