LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR176
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR176
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR176
Compare Versions
ACR176 Chaptered August 16, 2016
ACR176 Enrolled August 12, 2016
ACR176 Amended June 23, 2016
ACR176 Amended May 26, 2016
ACR176 Introduced April 28, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR176 Chaptered August 16, 2016
ACR176 Enrolled August 12, 2016
ACR176 Amended June 23, 2016
ACR176 Amended May 26, 2016
ACR176 Introduced April 28, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare