California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR176 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 28, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 16, 2016

Amended

Bill June 23, 2016
Bill May 26, 2016