Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2015 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 339.). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 175.) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2015 | Measure version as amended on January 12 corrected. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 147.) | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 8). | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 12/01/2014 | Introduced. To print. |