California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill February 20, 2015

Chaptered

Bill February 25, 2015

Amended

Bill February 5, 2015
Bill January 21, 2015
Bill January 12, 2015