LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR3
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR3
Compare Versions
ACR3 Chaptered February 25, 2015
ACR3 Enrolled February 20, 2015
ACR3 Amended February 5, 2015
ACR3 Amended January 21, 2015
ACR3 Amended January 12, 2015
ACR3 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
ACR3 Chaptered February 25, 2015
ACR3 Enrolled February 20, 2015
ACR3 Amended February 5, 2015
ACR3 Amended January 21, 2015
ACR3 Amended January 12, 2015
ACR3 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare