Assembly | 09/25/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 199, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/25/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2617.) | ||
Senate | 09/04/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/02/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2778.) | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2015 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2751.) | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 25). | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |