LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR36
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR36
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR36
Compare Versions
ACR36 Chaptered September 25, 2015
ACR36 Enrolled September 11, 2015
ACR36 Amended September 2, 2015
ACR36 Amended September 1, 2015
ACR36 Amended August 17, 2015
ACR36 Amended July 13, 2015
ACR36 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR36 Chaptered September 25, 2015
ACR36 Enrolled September 11, 2015
ACR36 Amended September 2, 2015
ACR36 Amended September 1, 2015
ACR36 Amended August 17, 2015
ACR36 Amended July 13, 2015
ACR36 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare