California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR36 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 13, 2015