Assembly | 07/01/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 2143.). | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1541.) | ||
Senate | 06/19/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1973.) | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |