LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR81
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR81
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR81
Compare Versions
ACR81 Chaptered July 1, 2015
ACR81 Enrolled June 29, 2015
ACR81 Amended June 19, 2015
ACR81 Amended June 11, 2015
ACR81 Introduced May 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR81 Chaptered July 1, 2015
ACR81 Enrolled June 29, 2015
ACR81 Amended June 19, 2015
ACR81 Amended June 11, 2015
ACR81 Introduced May 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare