California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR81 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2015

Amended

Bill June 19, 2015
Bill June 11, 2015