Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6148.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 5054.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 4682.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|