California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR28 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2016

Amended

Bill May 27, 2016
Bill May 5, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016