LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR28
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR28
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR28
Compare Versions
AJR28 Chaptered September 1, 2016
AJR28 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AJR28 Amended May 27, 2016
AJR28 Amended May 5, 2016
AJR28 Amended May 3, 2016
AJR28 Amended March 28, 2016
AJR28 Introduced January 26, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AJR28 Chaptered September 1, 2016
AJR28 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AJR28 Amended May 27, 2016
AJR28 Amended May 5, 2016
AJR28 Amended May 3, 2016
AJR28 Amended March 28, 2016
AJR28 Introduced January 26, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare