Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 6284.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 5297.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 13. Page 5703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|