LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR3
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR3
Compare Versions
AJR3 Chaptered September 1, 2016
AJR3 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AJR3 Amended August 19, 2016
AJR3 Amended August 4, 2016
AJR3 Amended June 28, 2016
AJR3 Amended May 19, 2016
AJR3 Introduced January 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AJR3 Chaptered September 1, 2016
AJR3 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AJR3 Amended August 19, 2016
AJR3 Amended August 4, 2016
AJR3 Amended June 28, 2016
AJR3 Amended May 19, 2016
AJR3 Introduced January 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare