California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill May 19, 2016