Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 6049.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4950.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 4458.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|