LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR32
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR32
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR32
Compare Versions
AJR32 Chaptered August 30, 2016
AJR32 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AJR32 Amended May 5, 2016
AJR32 Amended April 26, 2016
AJR32 Amended March 10, 2016
AJR32 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AJR32 Chaptered August 30, 2016
AJR32 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AJR32 Amended May 5, 2016
AJR32 Amended April 26, 2016
AJR32 Amended March 10, 2016
AJR32 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare