California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR32 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2016

Amended

Bill May 5, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill March 10, 2016