Assembly | 08/30/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2016 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6050.). | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4977.) | ||
Senate | 08/09/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5584.) | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | Introduced. To print. |