California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 1, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016